This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 11:00:33 (UTC).

Cynthia L. Held And Jill Salimbene

Case Summary

On 12/04/2014 Cynthia L Held And Jill Salimbene was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin, Pennypacker, Philip H and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2460

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cybthia Lyn Held

Morgan Hill, CA 95037

Petitioner

Held, Cynthia Lyn

Defendant

Jill Salimbene

Respondent

Salimbene, Jill

Minors

Held-salimbene, Lucca

Held-salimbene, Nicco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Perry, Laura A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Held, Cynthia Lyn; Salimbene, Jill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Judges Notes 05-05-15

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2015
  • Substitution: Attorney - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Text = w/pos Legacy Name = FL Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 05/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Text = Summons & Petition, UCCJEA, dec of residence, FL Notice Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 02/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Text = dec of residence, FL Notice attachment Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 02/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 02/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents-Conversion Case - Comment: Bulk Scan 12-04-14 to 10-29-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 12/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 12/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 12/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less