This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/05/2023 at 06:35:04 (UTC).

Criste v. Bio-Medical Applications of California, Inc. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 Criste filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Bio-Medical Applications of California, Inc Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5681

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Eric Criste

Defendant

Bio-Medical Applications of California, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kristen Michelle Agnew

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Lawsuit Notice

10/31/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/31/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/31/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/31/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/1/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/10/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6

11/15/2022 Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6

Order

12/5/2022 Order

Order

12/6/2022 Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Civil Supervising Judge's Order & Notice Reassigning Case to D1, Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding, following CCP 170.6 against Hon. Patricia M. Lucas - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Order Granting Plaintiff's CCP 170.6 against Hon. Patricia M. Lucas - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6; Filed By: Jeffrey Criste,; Comment: Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6 against Hon. Patricia M. Lucas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jeffrey Criste,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Jeffrey Criste,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Jeffrey Criste,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jeffrey Criste,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 3/22/23 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bio-Medical Applications of California, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara