This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 04:32:11 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., vs PERFECTVIPS, INC.;

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC , filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PERFECTVIPS, INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7185

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.,

Defendant

PERFECTVIPS, INC.;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Dale Frischer

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/8/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/8/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/27/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

UN Clerk Default Pending

3/2/2023 UN Clerk Default Pending

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: UN Clerk Default Pending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.,,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.,,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.,,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.,,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less