This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 03:05:13 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. vs OPPENHEIMER & CO. INC et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OPPENHEIMER CO INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2341

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.

Defendants

OPPENHEIMER & CO. INC

OPPENHEIMER HOLDINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth J. Freed

 

Court Documents

Notice

7/12/2021 Notice

Removal to Federal Court

7/12/2021 Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/6/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/6/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/14/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/14/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/14/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: OPPENHEIMER & CO. INC, OPPENHEIMER HOLDINGS INC.,; Comment: Defendants' Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Removal to Federal Court; Filed By: OPPENHEIMER & CO. INC, OPPENHEIMER HOLDINGS INC.,; Comment: Notice to the Clerk of the Superior Court of the Filing of Removal and Removal of Action to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Restored to court's control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.,; Comment: Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.,; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPPENHEIMER & CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREED KENNETH JAY