Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:23 (UTC).

Craig Menden vs Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Craig Menden filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Zayner, Theodore C and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2428

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Menden, Craig

Defendant

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chae, Larry

Defendant Attorney

Le, Hong Tuyet

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Court-Ordered Mediation (CV); Party: Names: Menden, Craig; Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Chae

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Chae

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To complaint; Atty Le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Civil Lawsuit Notice and Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less