This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:43:54 (UTC).

Courtney Fusco et al vs Johnny Frausto

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Courtney Fusco filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Johnny Frausto. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Stoelker, James L and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6077

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Stoelker, James L

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lockhart, Carolyn

Fusco, Courtney

Defendant

Frausto, Johnny

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelsen, Robert Michael

Defendant Attorney

Rivera, Christopher W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Other ADR (CV); Party: Names: Fusco, Courtney; Frausto, Johnny; Lockhart, Carolyn; Comment: Entire Action With Prejudice (Robert Nelsen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Entire Action With Prejudice (Robert Nelsen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Hearing: Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Hearing: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: FTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 12/20/18 Defendant's CM Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Response/Reply - Comment: Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause Regarding Failure to Serve Complaint and File POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: $150 jury fee deposited by atty Rivera for defendant Johnny Frausto.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fee for Plaintiffs Courtney Fusco and Carolyn Lockhart paid for by Atty Nelsen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: 7/17/18 2:15pm D13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less