Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:41:14 (UTC).

County of Santa Clara vs Dolores Villareal

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 County of Santa Clara filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Dolores Villareal. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Borovoy, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5003

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Borovoy, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of Santa Clara

Defendants

Villareal, Dolores

Villareal, Delores

Porter, Dolores

Villareal, Dolores Porter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: County of Santa Clara; Awarded Against: Villareal, Dolores; Amount; Damages: $888.00; Costs: $45.00; Total: $933.00; Comment: Payments are to be made at the rate of: $ 50.00 per: monthly, beginning on: 9/28/18 and on the 28th day of each month thereafter until paid in full. If any payment is missed, the entire balance may become due immediately.; Party: Names: County of Santa Clara; Villareal, Dolores

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees exempted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: on Certified Mail Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant - Comment: #70161370000004698251.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less