This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:52:28 (UTC).

County of Santa Clara vs April Paddock

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 County of Santa Clara filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against April Paddock. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Irene. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5992

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, Irene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of Santa Clara

Defendants

Paddock, April

Shay, A Paddock

Paddock, April E

Taddock, April

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: County of Santa Clara; Judgment Amount: $1,811.00; Awarded Against: Paddock, April; Amount; Damages: $1,746.00; Costs: $65.00; Total: $1811.00; Party: Names: County of Santa Clara; Paddock, April

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Abstract of Judgment: Item #1a, one of the listed aka's does not match as listed on judgment notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Cert Mail. Hrg: 12/11/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less