This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 13:25:07 (UTC).

County of Santa Clara vs Ann Sisk et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2017 County of Santa Clara filed an Other lawsuit against Ann Sisk. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0548

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of Santa Clara

Defendants

Ann Sisk

Randall Grinstead

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael L. Rossi

Rossi, Michael L.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs

12/12/2017 Memorandum of Costs

Application: Renewal Judgment

12/12/2017 Application: Renewal Judgment

Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued

12/12/2017 Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued

Proof of Service: Mail

12/12/2017 Proof of Service: Mail

Notice: Renewal of Judgment

12/20/2007 Notice: Renewal of Judgment

Application: Renewal Judgment

12/19/2007 Application: Renewal Judgment

Abstract of Judgment: Issued

10/16/2007 Abstract of Judgment: Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: County of Santa Clara,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued; Filed By: County of Santa Clara, Ann Sisk, Randall Grinstead,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application: Renewal Judgment; Filed By: County of Santa Clara,; Comment: Against: Ann Sisk, aka Bettie Ann Sisk, aka Bettie Ann Grinstead, and Randall Grinstead. $ 25,248.70

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: County of Santa Clara, Ann Sisk, Randall Grinstead,; Comment: Costs: $180.00; Credit: $10,338.28; Interest: $13,335.73 Date of mailing: 12/12/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Renewal of Judgment; Filed By: County of Santa Clara, Ann Sisk, Randall Grinstead,; Comment: Returned with POS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2007
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued; Filed By: County of Santa Clara, Ann Sisk, Randall Grinstead,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application: Renewal Judgment; Filed By: County of Santa Clara,; Comment: Against: Ann Sisk, aka Bettie Ann Sisk, aka Bettie Ann Grinstead, and Randall Grinstead. $ 17,912.97

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Abstract of Judgment: Issued; Filed By: County of Santa Clara,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/1998
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/1998
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/1998
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/1998
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rossi, Michael L.