This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:11 (UTC).

Conservatorship of Pedro Barajas

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Conservatorship of Pedro Barajas was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pichon, Rise Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2622

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pichon, Rise Jones

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Barajas, Yoland

Barajas, Yolanda

Conservatee

Barajas, Pedro

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • Letters: Conservatorship General - Comment: 2ND CORRECTED: PERSON AND ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Letters: Conservatorship General - Comment: CORRECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Order: Appoint Conservator Person and Estate - Comment: CORRECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Order - Comment: on Ex Parte Petition for Corrected Order and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Petition - Comment: Ex Parte for Corrected Orders and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Under Supervision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Comment: of Handbook

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Order: Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Letters: Conservatorship General

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Citation with Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: re hrg 3/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Declaration: Medical Practioner - Comment: Abdelsalam Mogasbe MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Conservator Duties Receipt of Handbook

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Confidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition: Appointment Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less