This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 01:41:54 (UTC).

Conservatorship of Kenneth Demblewski, Sr.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Conservatorship of Kenneth Demblewski, Sr was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2130

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mary Demblewski

Conservatee

Kenneth Demblewski

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Amanda R Van Hoesen

Michael Cook Crosby

Conservatee Attorney

Mary E MacLellan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Evidentiary; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letters: Temporary Conservator; Comment: Expire 1/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Appoint Conservator Person/Estate; Department: Department 5; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letters: Temporary Conservator; Comment: Expire 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Appoint Conservator Person/Estate; Department: Department 5; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Appoint Conservator Person/Estate; Department: Department 5; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: CI Report: Conservator Appointment; Filed By: Kenneth Demblewski,; Comment: Confidential Court Investigator's Appointment Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed; Filed By: Mary Demblewski,; Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of the Person & Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Confidential Screening Form; Filed By: Mary Demblewski,; Comment: Confidential Conservator Screening Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Confidential Supplemental Information; Filed By: Mary Demblewski,; Comment: Confidential Supplemental Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Filed By: Mary Demblewski,; Comment: Proposed Order Appointing Probate Conservator (& Cover Sheet)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Mary Demblewski,; Comment: Declaration Re Viewing Conservatorship Video

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed; Comment: Ex Parte Application for Good Cause Exception to Notice of Hearing on Appointment of Temporary Conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Mary Demblewski,; Comment: Declaration of Attorney Re Ex Parte Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Filed By: Mary Demblewski,; Comment: Proposed Order on Ex Parte Application

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed; Filed By: Mary Demblewski,; Comment: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of the Person & Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proposed Order: Ex Parte; Filed By: Mary Demblewski,; Comment: Proposed Order Appointing Temporary Conservator (& Cover Sheet)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less