This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:49:22 (UTC).

Conservatorship of Andrew Hogan

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Conservatorship of Andrew Hogan was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pichon, Rise Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4553

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pichon, Rise Jones

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Conservatees

hogan, andrew

hogan, wendy

hogan, chris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservatee Attorney

Canny, Paula K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • Determination: Appropriate Level of Care for Conservatee - Comment: Determination of Conservatee's Appropriate Level of Care

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Order: Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Hearing: Appoint Conservator Person/Estate - Judicial Officer: Pichon, Rise Jones; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: (ok per Judge) (Paul Canny 650-652-7862)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Under Supervision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Letters: Conservatorship General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Order: Appoint Conservator Person and Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Declaration: Medical Practioner - Comment: Capacity Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Citation: Issued - Comment: Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Please accept to replace the previously submitted GC 340

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Please accept to replace previous GC 330

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Please accept to replace previous submission of GC-141

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Confidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Confidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Confidential Supplemental Information - Comment: Supplemental

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Duties and Liabilities - Comment: confidential form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Appointment Conservator - Comment: petition for appointment of conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Appointment Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less