This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 10/13/2019 at 06:56:09 (UTC).

Colton Fields et al vs Marc Belluomini et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Colton Fields filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Marc Belluomini. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5988

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Abreupeixoto, Josh

Fields, Colton

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

The Estate Of Rolando Belluomini

Belluomini Family Trust

Belluomini, Marc Alan

Mezzetti, Robert, II

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Abreupeixoto, Josh

Fields, Colton

Mezzetti, Robert, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Cross, Orestes Alexander

Defendant Attorney

Slosser, Brian Scott

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Mezzetti, Christopher Robert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement 6/11/19 10am D8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Answer: Cross Complaint - Comment: To Complaint Atty: Cross

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Hearing: Order to Show Cause - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: FTA - No special or telephonic appearances. Plt s FTA may result in dismissal of the case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: served CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Cross-Complaint - Comment: of Marc Alan Belluomini & Belluomini Family Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint. Atty Mezzetti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less