This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 14:33:57 (UTC).

Colleen Burt and Eric Burt

Case Summary

On 04/08/2015 Colleen Burt and Eric Burt was filed as a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott, Stuart J and Grilli, Mary Ann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4371

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Scott, Stuart J

Grilli, Mary Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colleen Burt

Petitioner

Burt, Colleen

Defendant

Eric Burt

Respondent

Burt, Eric

Minors

Burt, Aiden James

Burt, Trudie Emmeline

Burt, Dylan Samuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Scott, Stuart J; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Burt, Colleen; Burt, Eric; Burt, Aiden James; Burt, Dylan Samuel; Burt, Trudie Emmeline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = M Closed = 11/02/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar, no appearance; Comment: Text = Set by (P)by agreement-lmg Result By = C Result Date = 09/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Text = petn, summ, blnk response, uccjea..; personal srvc 4/8/15 @ 1pm Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Petition: Legal Separation w/minor - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Legal Sep/Minor Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • Child Support Case Registry Form - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Child Support Case Registry Form Decision = M Closed = 08/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • Child Support Case Registry Form - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Child Support Case Registry Form Decision = M Closed = 07/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • Child Support Case Registry Form - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Child Support Case Registry Form Decision = M Closed = 07/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less