This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 21:16:22 (UTC).

Coast Insulation Contractors, Inc. vs Sundt Construction, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Coast Insulation Contractors, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sundt Construction, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Barrett, Thang N. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0460

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Barrett, Thang N

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Coast Insulation Contractors, Inc.

Coast Building Products

Defendant

Sundt Construction, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bayuk, Christopher Webb

Christopher Webb Bayuk

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice

11/5/2020 Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/9/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/9/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice; Filed By: Coast Insulation Contractors, Inc.,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Coast Insulation Contractors, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Coast Insulation Contractors, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Coast Insulation Contractors, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sundt Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Coast Building Products is a litigant

Latest cases where Coast Insulation Contractors, Inc. DBA Coast Building Products is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYUK CHRISTOPHER WEBB