This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 16:08:50 (UTC).

Clinton Wu vs Wanliang Lee

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Clinton Wu filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Wanliang Lee. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1386

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Clinton Wu

Respondent

Wanliang Lee

Minors

Cooper Wu

Maxwell Wu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Doris Shan Mei

Respondent Attorney

Kimberly A Madigan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee; Filed By: Wanliang Lee,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation & Order; Comment: atty fees and costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation & Order; Comment: Stipulation & Order for Custody & Visitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation & Order Appointment of Temporary Judge; Filed By: Clinton Wu,; Comment: Stipulation & Order for Judge Pro Tem for Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation & Order; Filed By: Clinton Wu,; Comment: retroactivity of c/s and s/s

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Wanliang Lee,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge; Filed By: Clinton Wu,; Comment: stipulation for appointment of temp judge s/o for appointment of judge pro tem s/o appointing temp judge for limited purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Clinton Wu,; Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Wanliang Lee,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response: Dissolution; Filed By: Wanliang Lee,

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Clinton Wu,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Clinton Wu,; Comment: Acknowledgement/Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Clinton Wu,; Comment: Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Clinton Wu,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Enforcement Act; Filed By: Clinton Wu,; Comment: Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Other; Filed By: Clinton Wu,; Comment: Family Law Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MADIGAN, KIMBERLY A