This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 13:10:34 (UTC).

Clark Pacific vs SC Builders, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Clark Pacific filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SC Builders, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Barrett, Thang N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8747

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Barrett, Thang N

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clark Pacific

Defendants

Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

SC Builders, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Schoenfeld, D. Michael

Dale C. Campbell

Cameron M. Peyton

Josiah Mark Prendergast

Defendant Attorneys

Rocha, Stephanie M.

Stephanie M. Rocha

 

Court Documents

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/28/2022 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/28/2022 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/28/2022 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Conference: Trial Setting

11/9/2021 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

11/9/2021 Conference: Trial Setting

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/27/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/27/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/21/2020 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/21/2020 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

11/12/2020 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/12/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/16/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/18/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Order: Submitted Matter

6/8/2021 Order: Submitted Matter

Notice: Entry of Order

6/11/2021 Notice: Entry of Order

Notice: Settlement

11/1/2021 Notice: Settlement

Minute Order

11/12/2021 Minute Order

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 19; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: SC Builders, Inc., Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland,; Comment: Notice: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Clark Pacific,; Comment: Notice: Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Submitted Matter; Comment: re: Def SC Builder's 5-27-21 MSJ/MSA - DENIED by Judge Kirwan *see order for details*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication; Department: Department 19; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Amended Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Clark Pacific,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland,; Comment: to Complaint. Atty Rocha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: SC Builders, Inc.,; Comment: to Complaint. Atty Rocha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Clark Pacific,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Clark Pacific,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Clark Pacific,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SC Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peyton, Cameron Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOENFELD, D MICHAEL