This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 05:57:56 (UTC).

City Of San Jose vs MediMarts, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 10/24/2014 City Of San Jose filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MediMarts, Inc . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L, Folan, Maureen A, Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2374

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

City Of San Jose

Armstrong, David James

Medimarts, Inc.

David Armstrong

Armstrong, David

Medimarts, An Unincorporated Association

Taormino, Joseph

Medimarts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark VanNi

200 East Santa Clara St., 16Th Floor Tower

San Jose, CA 95113-1905

Vanni, Mark

Horner, Stephen

Perez, Anthony L

Watt, Cameron Donald

Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Horner, Stephen

Doyle, Richard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2018
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Old: Horner New: Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Order - Comment: RE: City's motion for summary judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Court Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Est. 10 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Conference: Settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Counsel o brief the Court why this should be a Jury Trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: by Plt (Matthew Pritchard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Order re: City's Motion for Summary Judgmet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Order - Comment: City's Motion for Summary Judgment of the SAXC is Granted by Judge Arand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: by Plt/X-Def City of San Jose (Matthew Pritchard)

    Read MoreRead Less
219 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2015
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Set for: further CMC; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = ES4 - Strickland, Elizabeth Result Date = 02/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Jury Fee Deposit - Comment: $150 deposited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Atty Vanni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • Complaint: Amended - Comment: No summons issued. Atty Vanni. 1st Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less