This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 16:59:37 (UTC).

City Of San Jose, Finance Department vs W. Weber

Case Summary

On 07/28/2010 City Of San Jose, Finance Department filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against W Weber. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Irene, Steingart, Lisa and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0664

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Irene

Steingart, Lisa

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City Of San Jose, Finance Department

San Jose, CA 95113

Defendants

William Weber

San Jose, CA 95125

Weber, William

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Weber, William; Party: Name: City Of San Jose, Finance Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Weber, William; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: City Of San Jose, Finance Department; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: City Of San Jose, Finance Department; Judgment Amount: $3,007.20; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Weber, William; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $90.00; Other: $2,917.20; Total: $3007.20; Comment: clerkid=382; printdate=Dec 20 2010; freetext=Default Judgment, defendant shall pay plaintiff on plaintiff's claim. Pltf amends claim amount in court.; origjudgdate=Dec 15 2010; judgstatusdate=Dec 20 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Weber, William; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: City Of San Jose, Finance Department; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: CREDIT: $300.00: INTEREST: $500.89: DATE: 09/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: Costs $ 0.00, Credit $ 0.00, Interest $ 522.31 DOM: 11/07/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = INTEREST: $445.27 DATE: 09/01/15 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Bench warrant order issued; Comment: Text = BW issued for William Weber bail set at $ 6,200.00 Result By = C Result Judge = CC2 - Copeland, Christine Result Date = 03/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 04/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = served BW by personal service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Warrant: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = BW for William Weber - WP - hearing set for 3/30/15 Legacy Name = SC Bench Warrant/Ord of Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2011
  • Certificate of Mailing - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • Motion: Set Aside/Vacate (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc:Mtn to Vacate Jgmt/Decl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = IS - Smith, Irene Result Date = 12/15/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 12/17/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = IS - Smith, Irene Result Date = 10/04/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 10/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 07/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = claim amount $3,200.00 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less