Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 02:49:53 (UTC).

City of San Jose Finance Department vs Gregory Malley Sr et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2016 City of San Jose Finance Department filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gregory Malley Sr. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Steves, Bern. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5062

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Steves, Bern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of San Jose Finance Department

Defendants

Malley Sr, Gregory Thomas

Malley, Vanisri Vajjhala

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steves, Bern; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: City of San Jose Finance Department; Awarded Against: Malley Sr, Gregory Thomas; Malley, Vanisri Vajjhala; Amount; Damages: $1,137.50; Costs: $110.00; Total: $1247.50; Comment: Judg't is joint and several.; Party: Names: City of San Jose Finance Department; Malley Sr, Gregory Thomas; Malley, Vanisri Vajjhala

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Judgment: Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: 06-10-16 to 01-19-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Request - Comment: for funds by Judgment Creditor - request given to accounting.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2017
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Comment: Paid judg't to court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Comment: AGAINST: Gregory Thomas Malley Sr. & Vanisri Vajhala Malley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Comment: hold in tickler until 2/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Steves, Bern; Comment: Mailed 1/11/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steves, Bern; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued by Court due to stoppage; strike in a effect.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation: Court Appointed Temporary Judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT AND THINGS AT TRIAL OF HEARING AND DECLARATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less