This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 02:47:03 (UTC).

City of Mountain View vs Geoffrey Kane et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 City of Mountain View filed an Other lawsuit against Geoffrey Kane. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3242

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

City of Mountain View

Respondents

Kane, Ashley

Kane, Geoffrey

Not Classified By Court

Assistant District Attorney

Department of Justice, Firearms

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wright, Nicole Clemens

Respondent Attorney

Morales, Alfredo M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2018
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: see attached filing for details

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Original Type: Conference: Trial Setting; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: *C/F 11/28/17*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Original Type: Conference: Trial Setting; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Hearing: Other - Original Type: Hearing: Other; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Response to Petition regarding Disposition of Weapons by Respondent Geoffrey Kane (Alfredo M. Morales) c/f 9/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Hearing: Other - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Response to Petition regarding Disposition of Weapons by Respondent Geoffrey Kane (Alfredo M. Morales)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Response/Reply - Comment: Response to petition regarding disposition of weapons and request for hrg pursuant PC 18410. 9/21/17 @ 9am D6. Atty Morales.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • First Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: Taken on response to petition regarding disposition of weapons and request for hrg pursuant PC 18410.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: petition and declarations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: petition and declarations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: of Police Office of Daniel Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: of Police Property and Evidence Specialist Tim Downey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: of Police Officer Emilia Mancilla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: of Police Lieutenant Frank St. Clair

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Assistant District Attorney is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Justice is a litigant