This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 07:26:08 (UTC).

City of Cupertino v. Siemens Industry, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2014 City of Cupertino filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Siemens Industry, Inc . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Overton, Carol, Folan, Maureen A, Kirwan, Peter, Strickland, Elizabeth and Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2838

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Overton, Carol

Folan, Maureen A

Kirwan, Peter

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City Of Cupertino

Defendants

Siemens Industry, Inc.

Hydropoint Data Systems,Inc.

Other

Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas J Trachuk

1939 Harrison Street, Suite 913

Oakland, CA 94612-3578

Hom, Randolph Stevenson

Murray, Thomas Joseph

Defendant Attorneys

Trachtman, Benjamin R.

Crawford, Terri L.

Beeman, Christopher J.

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

NOE of Dismissal and POS.pdf:

Notice

Notice DASH 3-10-17 at 10am in D5: Comment: Dismissal After Settlement Hearing set for 3/10/17 at 10am in D5; trial and pretrial dates are vacated.

Notice: Settlement

Notice: Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Order

Order Case is Reassigned to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle

Notice

Notice CMC 2 17 17 at 10am in D1: Comment: CMC set for 2/17/17 at 10am in D1

Statement: Case Management Conference

Joint CMC Stmt UPDATED for 9-30 CMC final.pdf: Comment: (Joint)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 20 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Conference: Trial Management - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: FINAL Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Dismissal After Settlement Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - NOE of Dismissal and POS.pdf:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice DASH 3-10-17 at 10am in D5: Comment: Dismissal After Settlement Hearing set for 3/10/17 at 10am in D5; trial and pretrial dates are vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: Settlement - Notice: Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Case is Reassigned to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2015
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Atty Beeman Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 03/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Atty Trachtman Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 03/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = atty Beeman Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 03/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = Atty Trachtman. Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = re: Ntc/ Pf/service: Siemen Industry, Inc.and Hydropoint Data Systems, Inc. of summons and complt (Atty T. Trachuk) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Personal Svc Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = re (Atty T. Trachuck) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = re (Atty T. Trachuk) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less