This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 03:14:59 (UTC).

Citibank (South Dakota) N.A. vs J. Thompson

Case Summary

On 12/28/2009 Citibank South Dakota N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against J Thompson. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernardini, Susan and McKenney, Kevin E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4541

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bernardini, Susan

McKenney, Kevin E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.

Defendants

Janice K Thompson

Thompson, Janice K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Janalie A. Henriques

151 Bernal Road, Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

Henriques, Janalie A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Thompson, Janice K; Party: Name: Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Judge, Inactive; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Thompson, Janice K; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.; Judgment Amount: $15,619.39; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Thompson, Janice K; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $389.00; Other: $15,230.39; Total: $15619.39; Comment: clerkid=319; printdate=Aug 31 2010; freetext=Total Judgment $15,619.39; origjudgdate=Aug 31 2010; judgstatusdate=Aug 31 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=09LT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = Santa Clara, issued 01/11/11 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 03/19/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2011
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = $15,644.39 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC Decision = M Closed = 01/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 09/10/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Judgment: Default - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = Total Judgment $15,619.39 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = Re: waiver of interest, atty fees and costs, waiver of atty fees Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = costs $389.00 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Diligence Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = subserved Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss >$10k Decision = M Closed = 12/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENRIQUES JANALIE