This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:30:46 (UTC).

Citibank, N.A. vs Corena Ramirez

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Citibank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Corena Ramirez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1855

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

Ramirez, Corena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Napier, Rachel Nikkole

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Citibank, N.A.; Ramirez, Corena; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Corena Ramirez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Default Not Entered - Comment: POS-010 not filed at the time of default request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less