This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/26/2022 at 18:06:28 (UTC).

Cole v. Captain Kirk Services, Inc., et al. (PAGA)

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Cole filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Captain Kirk Services, Inc , PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5507

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chyna Cole

Defendants

Marc Matulich

CAPTAIN KIRK SERVICES, INC.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David D Bibiyan

Jeffrey D Klein

Jean Hopkins Power

Defendant Attorney

James K. Roberts

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/27/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/27/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

10/27/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/1/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Notice: Related Cases

12/7/2022 Notice: Related Cases

Motion: Consolidate

12/12/2022 Motion: Consolidate

Order

12/12/2022 Order

Proof of Service

12/13/2022 Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Consolidate; Department: Department 1; Time: 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Marc Matulich, Captain Kirk Services, Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Civil Supervising Judge's Order & Notice Relating Cases and Reassigning Related Cases to D1, Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Consolidate; Filed By: Marc Matulich, Captain Kirk Services, Inc.,; Comment: HRG 3/23/23 Motion to Consolidate Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: Marc Matulich, Captain Kirk Services, Inc.,; Comment: Notice of Related Case 22CV401830

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Chyna Cole,; Comment: PAGA Representative Action Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Chyna Cole,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Chyna Cole,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * PAGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 3/15/23 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant