This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 13:37:31 (UTC).

Gray v. Skye Enterprises-2296, LLC, et al. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Gray filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Skye Enterprises-2296, LLC, Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7454

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER GRAY

Defendants

SKYE ENTERPRISES-2296, LLC

MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTERS, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin F Marquez

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/30/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/30/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

11/30/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

12/2/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/28/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: CHRISTOPHER GRAY,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: CHRISTOPHER GRAY,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff + Jury Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CHRISTOPHER GRAY,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: CHRISTOPHER GRAY,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 4/19/23 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEINEKE CAR CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara