This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 17:53:56 (UTC).

Christopher Garcia et al vs Alexandria Real Estate Equities, LP et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2016 Christopher Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Alexandria Real Estate Equities, LP. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGowen, Beth, Folan, Maureen A and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2245

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGowen, Beth

Folan, Maureen A

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Galloway, Holly

Garcia, Christopher

Gallaway, Holly

Claimant

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ARE-San Francisco No. 33, LLC

Alexandria Real Estate Equities, Inc.

ARE-QRS Corp.

Alexandria Real Estate Equities, LP

Environmental & Occupational Risk Management, Inc.

Cross Defendant

NGM Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wong, Kimberly Anne

Leonard, John

Claimant Attorney

Kirkgaard, Susan Elaine

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Endres, Richard Stephen

Le Montree, Darren

Hyde, James C.

Young, Kenyon Morris

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Garcia, Christopher; Gallaway, Holly; Alexandria Real Estate Equities, LP; Alexandria Real Estate Equities, Inc.; ARE-San Francisco No. 33, LLC; ARE-QRS Corp.; Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; NGM Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Comment: Partial w/ Prejudice (Kimberly Wong)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: C/F 10-26-17 by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Dismissal - Entire Action - Comment: with prejudice/Atty-Kimberly Wong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Dismissal - Comment: with prejudice as to Def Alexander Real Estate Equities, LP; Alexandria Real Estate Equities, Inc.; ARE-San Francisco No.33, LLC and ARE-QRS Corp./only (Kimberly Wong)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: 1st

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Order - Comment: for leave to file a first amended complaint and to modify the caption to correct the spelling of a plt's name is granted signed by Judge McGowen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: RE First Amended Complaint - leave of Court required if changing the name of a party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: **STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/12/16** (Filed on Demand) To First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: **STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/12/16**(Filed on Demand) First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: RE First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less