This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 04:27:06 (UTC).

Christopher Fargo vs Lindsey Huey

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 Christopher Fargo filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Lindsey Huey. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lie, Cynthia C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3276

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lie, Cynthia C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fargo, Christopher

Respondent

Huey, Lindsey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Remer, Stacy E

Respondent Attorney

Huey, Jessica Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lie, Cynthia C; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Fargo, Christopher; Huey, Lindsey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Huey 10/27 both parties agree, for jgmt /rlg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee - Comment: Sharon L Roper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) (p)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2017
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Substitution of Attorney (p) 308776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Comment: Acknowledgement/Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Response: Dissolution - Comment: Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Comment: Petition: Dissolution no minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Huey, Jessica Lee