This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 02:34:00 (UTC).

Christopher Cook vs Michelle Cook

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 Christopher Cook filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Michelle Cook. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1171

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christopher Cook

Respondent

Michelle Cook

Minors

Kaylee Cook

Aria Cook

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gina Azzolino

Respondent Attorney

John Edward Scardamaglia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation & Order; Comment: re: regular timeshare, thanksgiving and christmas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Post Mediation Hearing; Department: Department 75; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Post Mediation Hearing; Department: Department 75; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Post Mediation Hearing; Department: Department 75; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Post Mediation Hearing; Department: Department 75; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Findings & Order After Hearing; Filed By: Christopher Cook,; Comment: heard 10/20/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Mod Custody/Visitation/Support; Department: Department 75; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Mod Custody/Visitation/Support; Department: Department 75; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Christopher Cook,; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response: Dissolution; Filed By: Michelle Cook,; Comment: Response: Dissolution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Michelle Cook,; Comment: Declaration Re: UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Christopher Cook,; Comment: Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Christopher Cook,; Comment: Declaration Re: UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Christopher Cook,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less