This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 01:36:18 (UTC).

Christine Olszewski vs David Olszewski

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 Christine Olszewski filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against David Olszewski. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3411

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christine Olszewski

Respondent

David Olszewski

Minors

Ethan Olszewski

Adrian Olszewski

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Christopher Duane Hirz

Steven P. Meyers

Respondent Attorney

Bill Woodcock

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: JSSC; Department: Department 64; Time: 8:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Questionnaire: Case Status/Resolution Conference; Filed By: David Olszewski,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Christine Olszewski,; Comment: Proof of Service: Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Findings & Order After Hearing; Filed By: Christine Olszewski,; Comment: heard on 7/6/21; s/s

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: David Olszewski,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Christine Olszewski,; Comment: (P) Atty Fee Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Christine Olszewski,; Comment: (P)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Christine Olszewski,; Comment: Declaration Re: UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Christine Olszewski,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Christine Olszewski,; Comment: Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Christine Olszewski,; Comment: Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less