This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 05:00:02 (UTC).

Christina Wynhamer and Philip F. Wynhamer

Case Summary

On 09/25/2015 Christina Wynhamer and Philip F Wynhamer was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Towery, James E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5341

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Towery, James E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina Wynhamer

Petitioner

Wynhamer, Christina

Defendant

Philip F Wynhamer

Respondent

Wynhamer, Philip F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Scardamaglia

111 North Market Street, Suite 300

San Jose, CA 95113

Petitioner Attorney

Conway, John H.

Respondent Attorney

Martelle, Eva Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: rsp suppl response to demand for prod of docs set 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Ptr. Prod. Docs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Martelle 9/12 by agreement-MV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Finding & Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Findings & Order After Hearing - Comment: 6/21/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Request for Order : Support - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: (p) initial s/s, atty fees [set per moving party]-pjn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2016
  • Proof of Mailing - Comment: form interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Substitution: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Conference: Status - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: (p) set by non agreement, rsp uncooperative -mm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 10/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: Bulk Scan 09-25-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 09/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 09/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less