This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 00:56:54 (UTC).

Chrissa Imports Ltd, vs. California Cider Co, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 Chrissa Imports Ltd, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against California Cider Co, INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7278

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

ELYXIR DISTRIBUTING, LLC

ELYXIR DISTRIBUTING, INC.

DBI BEVERAGE SAN JOSE

Not Yet Classified

CALIFORNIA CIDER CO, INC.

CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Ory Ben-Zion Sandel

Richard Jay Idell

Lynn Rene Fiorentino

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/29/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/29/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/11/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/11/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/15/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Statement: Case Management Conference

7/29/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Clerk Rejection Letter

7/30/2019 Clerk Rejection Letter

Clerk Rejection Letter

8/2/2019 Clerk Rejection Letter

Proof of Service: Electronic

8/6/2019 Proof of Service: Electronic

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

8/6/2019 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Proof of Service: Electronic

8/9/2019 Proof of Service: Electronic

Notice

8/9/2019 Notice

Minute Order

8/13/2019 Minute Order

Request: Dismissal

9/5/2019 Request: Dismissal

Proof of Service: Electronic

9/9/2019 Proof of Service: Electronic

Cross-Complaint

9/9/2019 Cross-Complaint

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/9/2019 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,; Comment: entire with prejudice by attys Schneider and Idell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,; Comment: Notice: Settlement Of Entire Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,; Comment: Chrissa Imports Ltd.'s Answer to California Cider Co., Inc.'s Cross-Complaint for Declaratory Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,; Comment: $150 PAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: CALIFORNIA CIDER CO, INC., ELYXIR DISTRIBUTING, LLC, DBI BEVERAGE SAN JOSE,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: CALIFORNIA CIDER CO, INC.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: DBI BEVERAGE SAN JOSE,; Comment: To Complaint atty: Sandel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: ELYXIR DISTRIBUTING, LLC,; Comment: To Complaint atty: Sandel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Filed By: CALIFORNIA CIDER CO, INC.,; Comment: To Complaint atty: Sandel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: CALIFORNIA CIDER CO, INC.,; Comment: ENV# 3190661 / POS - REQUIRES PROPER CAPTION PAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: CALIFORNIA CIDER CO, INC.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons DBI Beverage San Jose

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Elyxir Distributing Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: CHRISSA IMPORTS, LTD.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIORENTINO, LYNN R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ory Ben-Zion Sandel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IDELL RICHARD J