This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 00:12:42 (UTC).

Chelsea Brock vs Chunmin Zhang et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Chelsea Brock filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against Chunmin Zhang. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1856

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chelsea Brock

Defendants

Chunmin Zhang

BANGHAO YUAN

STEVEN WEN

HAIXU YUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amber Danette Pearce

Ryan M Herrera

Defendant Attorney

Robert Mark Maltz

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/23/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Statement: Case Management Conference

8/16/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Review: Mediation Status

2/17/2022 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

2/17/2022 Review: Mediation Status

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/23/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/23/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/15/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/15/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/30/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Chelsea Brock,; Comment: Conditional; Date: 12/31/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Chunmin Zhang, BANGHAO YUAN, STEVEN WEN,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Chelsea Brock,; Comment: PARTIAL; w/o prejudice as to Def. Steven Wen Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Chunmin Zhang, BANGHAO YUAN, STEVEN WEN,; Comment: $150 PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Chelsea Brock,; Comment: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Chelsea Brock,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Demand: Jury Trial; Filed By: Chunmin Zhang, BANGHAO YUAN, STEVEN WEN,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Demand: Jury Trial; Filed By: Chunmin Zhang, BANGHAO YUAN, STEVEN WEN,; Comment: and posting of jury fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Chelsea Brock,; Comment: as to Haixy Yuan ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Chelsea Brock,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons and Declarations Haixu Yuan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Chelsea Brock,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Chunmin Zhang

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Chelsea Brock,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Bangnao Yuan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Chelsea Brock,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Chelsea Brock,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MALTZ, ROBERT MARK