This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 10:55:40 (UTC).

Check In Cash Out vs J. Lopez, et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2013 Check In Cash Out filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J Lopez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are State, Christina, Zepeda, Carrie and Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9576

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

State, Christina

Zepeda, Carrie

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Check In Cash Out

1111 W. El Camino Real, #119

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

Defendants

Joann K Lopez

San Bruno, CA 94066

Alejandro Enriquez

Castro Valley, CA 94546

Joann K. Lopez

San Bruno, CA 94066

Lopez, Joann K.

Enriquez, Alejandro

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Enriquez, Alejandro; Party: Name: Lopez, Joann K.; Party: Name: Check In Cash Out

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Enriquez, Alejandro; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Check In Cash Out; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Check In Cash Out; Awarded Against: Enriquez, Alejandro; Comment: printdate=May 19 2014; freetext=Judgment is GRANTED in favor of Plt Check In Cash Out and against Def Alejandro Enriquez, for a total judgment of $0.00, signed Judge Zepeda.; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=May 14 2014; judgstatusdate=May 19 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Enriquez, Alejandro; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Lopez, Joann K.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Check In Cash Out; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Check In Cash Out; Judgment Amount: $5,400.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Enriquez, Alejandro; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $200.00; Other: $5,200.00; Total: $5400.00; Comment: printdate=Mar 25 2014; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Jan 19 2014; judgstatusdate=Mar 25 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Enriquez, Alejandro; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Lopez, Joann K.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Check In Cash Out; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Check In Cash Out; Judgment Amount: $5,400.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Enriquez, Alejandro; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $200.00; Costs: $0.00; Other: $5,200.00; Total: $5400.00; Comment: printdate=Jan 29 2014; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Jan 27 2014; judgstatusdate=Jan 29 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Enriquez, Alejandro; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Lopez, Joann K.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Check In Cash Out; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 05/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Comment: Text = Judgment is GRANTED in favor of Plt Check In Cash Out and against Def Alejandro Enriquez, for a total judgment of $0.00, signed Judge Zepeda. Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = R Closed = 05/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Not Heard: Decision on Submitted Matter; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CZ - Zepeda, Carrie Result Date = 05/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Check In Cash Out vs J. Lopez, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2014
  • Motion: Set Aside/Vacate (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc:Mtn to Vacate Jgmt/Decl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 01/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 11/25/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Date = 09/27/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 08/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: State, Christina; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Off calendar: no service - reset; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CS2 - State, Christiana Result Date = 07/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 06/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less