This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/02/2022 at 12:14:39 (UTC).

Charlotte S. Park and Tae H. Ku

Case Summary

On 02/18/2014 Charlotte S Park and Tae H Ku was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1992

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Charlotte S Park

Respondent

Tae Hoe Ku

Minors

Javin Ku

Jaun Ku

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2014
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 80; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Tae Ku,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Stip/Waiver:Final Decl of Disclosure Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Default/DS/LS; Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336; Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family); Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Child Support Case Registry Form; Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Child Support Case Registry Form Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Child Support Case Registry Form; Filed By: Tae Ku,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Child Support Case Registry Form Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • DocketDescription: FC 2336 Packet Received for Review; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = G Closed = 06/12/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Text = petn, summ, blnk response, uccjea..; personal srvc 3/13/14 @ 412pm Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL Req: Entry of Default Decision = G Closed = 05/13/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 02/18/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/18/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 02/18/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution no minor; Filed By: Charlotte Park,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 02/18/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: Miscellaneous: Converted Document; Comment: Charlotte S. Park and Tae H. Ku

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less