This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 14:59:31 (UTC).

Century Link Communications LLC et al vs County of Santa Clara et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Century Link Communications LLC filed an Other lawsuit against County of Santa Clara. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8242

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Century Link Communications LLC

Level 3 Communications LLC

Defendants

The State Board of Equalization

County of Santa Clara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Boersch, Martha Ann

Martha Ann Boersch

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/6/2021 Minute Order

Application and Order

6/21/2021 Application and Order

Order: Proposed

6/21/2021 Order: Proposed

Statement: Case Management Conference

6/21/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/25/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/25/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Conference: Further Case Management

1/18/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/3/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Order

1/13/2022 Order

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/18/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/18/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Conference: Further Case Management

3/22/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Century Link Communications LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint - BOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Century Link Communications LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint - County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Century Link Communications LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC,; Comment: re; Order continuing Case Deadlines. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Takaichi, Dept. 2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Century Link Communications LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application and Order; Filed By: Century Link Communications LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC,; Comment: NOTICE RE STATUTORY DEADLINE TO SERVE COMPLAINT UNDER REVENUE AND TAXATION CODE SECTION 5147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Century Link Communications LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Century Link Communications LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Century Link Communications LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC,; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Century Link Communications LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Century Link Communications, LLC FKA is a litigant

Latest cases where Level 3 Communications LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boersch, Martha A