This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:50:47 (UTC).

CENTER FOR PAIN & REHABILITATION MEDICINE, INC., vs TICIANE VIEIRA et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 CENTER FOR PAIN REHABILITATION MEDICINE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TICIANE VIEIRA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6092

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTER FOR PAIN & REHABILITATION MEDICINE, INC.,

Defendants

VIEIRA, TICIANE

VIEIRA, HELIO

1 through 50, inclusive, DOES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gibson, Heather Elizabeth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: CENTER FOR PAIN & REHABILITATION MEDICINE, INC.,; VIEIRA, TICIANE; VIEIRA, HELIO; 1 through 50, inclusive, DOES; Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Gibson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Gibson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG - 12/18/2018 - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG-07/17/2018 - atty Gibson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: HELIO VIEIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: TICIANE VIEIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less