This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:51:21 (UTC).

Center for Pain & Rehabilitation Medicine, Inc. vs Cynthia Williams

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Center for Pain Rehabilitation Medicine, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cynthia Williams. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Stoelker, James L and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6104

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Stoelker, James L

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Center for Pain & Rehabilitation Medicine, Inc.

Defendant

Williams, Cynthia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gibson, Heather E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: Bankrupcty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG - 08/01/2019 - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: by Plaintiff at the CMC 07-17-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Notice of Bankruptcy Stay - Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service (as to Request for Entry of Default)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Default Pending - Comment: ***PENDING***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Default Pending - Comment: BASIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Cynthia Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less