Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:53:43 (UTC).

Celia Enriquez vs Pablo Lagunas

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 Celia Enriquez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Pablo Lagunas. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1279

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Enriquez, Celia

Respondent

Lagunas, Pablo Magana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: Petitioner's Community and Quasi-Community Property Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: Petitioner's Separate Property Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less