Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 15:24:07 (UTC).

Cedar Business Service, LLC vs Nitesh Jain

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 Cedar Business Service, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nitesh Jain. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirwan, Peter and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3634

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirwan, Peter

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cedar Business Service, LLC

Cedar Financial

Defendant

Jain, Nitesh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dix, Lloyd Douglas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Cedar Business Service, LLC; Jain, Nitesh; Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Dix

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: ENVELOPE# 2301785 // UNABLE TO FILE DOCUMENT SINCE DEFENDANT HAS NOT PAID FIRST FILING FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: and Failure to Serve *No Special or Telephonic Appearance*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Dix

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Financial is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS BUSINESS SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIX LLOYD DOUGLAS