This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:52:13 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs Raul Flores, Sr.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Raul Flores, Sr. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5999

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Defendant

Flores, Raul, Sr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Quall, Matthew Warren

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • Declaration: In Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Waiver of Interest In Excess of 10%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Waiver of Security Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Waiver of Attorneys' fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Declaration: CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Does Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: ***PROPOSED***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Default Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less