This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:50:30 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs Justin Stuyt

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Justin Stuyt. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6082

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

as assignee of Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

Stuyt, Justin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Park, Brooke Y.

Meyering, Maxwell R.

Defendant Attorney

Grace, Scott Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Cavalry SPV I, LLC; Stuyt, Justin; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Vos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Vos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:46 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Answer (Limited): By Assignee <$5K - Comment: Attorney Grace

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Reduced Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Justin Stuyt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Affidavit - Comment: Re Reduced Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Filed by Assignee <$5K

    Read MoreRead Less