This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 23:13:55 (UTC).

Catherine Seidel vs Bayshore Motor Group, et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2016 Catherine Seidel filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bayshore Motor Group. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Elfving, William J, Stoelker, James L and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4635

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Elfving, William J

Stoelker, James L

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seidel, Catherine

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc.

Suppes, John

Toyota Motor Corporation

Lozano Car Wash, Inc.

Clarum Corporation

Toyota Motor North America

Byldan Corporation

Tesla Motors, Inc.

Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Lozano Car Wash, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Koss, Hugh Richard

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Nelch, H. Gregory

Yen, Thomas

Beeman, Christopher J.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Beeman, Christopher J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered (CV, PR); Party: Names: Seidel, Catherine; Suppes, John; Byldan Corporation; Clarum Corporation; Lozano Car Wash, Inc.; Comment: Dismissed Without Prejudice for Failure to Appear on 06-28-18, Per Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Comment: Partial: Complaint Without Prejudice (Hugh R. Koss)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Suppes, John; Byldan Corporation; Clarum Corporation; Comment: Partial: Cross-Complaint Without Prejudice by John Suppes; Byland Corporation and Clarum Corporation Only as to Toyota Motor Corporation; Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.; Toyota Motor North America, Inc.; Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada, Inc., and Tesla Motors, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Beeman as to Cross Complaint against John Suppes, Byldan Corporation and Clarum Corporation only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Ross as to the Complaint only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Est. 7 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (Settlements)

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: cross complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Demand: Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: civil sheet not filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less