This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 18:43:45 (UTC).

Catherine Adams vs Menekshe Law Firm, APC et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Catherine Adams filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Menekshe Law Firm, APC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0684

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiffs

Catherine Adams

Menekshe Law Firm, APC

Ayhan Menekshe

Not Yet Classified and Defendants

Menekshe Law Firm, APC

Ayhan Menekshe

Interested Party

Law Offices of Kenneth A. Freedman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorneys

Lori J. Costanzo

Lisa E. Aguiar

Not Yet Classified and Defendant Attorney

Lisa E. Aguiar

Interested Party Attorney

Kenneth A Freedman

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

4/5/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

4/5/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/7/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Summons: Issued/Filed

3/19/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/19/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/19/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/19/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service

7/7/2021 Proof of Service

Minute Order

2/3/2022 Minute Order

Response/Reply

1/27/2022 Response/Reply

Declaration

1/27/2022 Declaration

Proof of Service

1/27/2022 Proof of Service

Motion (Amended)

1/26/2022 Motion (Amended)

Proof of Service: Electronic

1/26/2022 Proof of Service: Electronic

Opposition/Objections

1/21/2022 Opposition/Objections

Declaration

1/21/2022 Declaration

Proof of Service

1/21/2022 Proof of Service

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Quash; Department: Department 20; Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Demurrer; Department: Department 20; Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Compel; Department: Department 20; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response/Reply; Filed By: Catherine Adams,; Comment: 2-3-22 9am dept.20 Plaintiff's Reply ISO Motion to Compel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Catherine Adams,; Comment: Declaration of Lucy Goodnough ISO Reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Catherine Adams,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion (Amended); Filed By: Law Offices of Kenneth A. Freedman,; Comment: AMENDED, 4/5/2022, 9AM, DEPT. 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Catherine Adams,

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Catherine Adams,; Comment: 2021-07-07 Adams - First Amended Complaint for Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Catherine Adams,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Catherine Adams,; Comment: POS of Summons - Ayhan Menekshe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Catherine Adams,; Comment: POS of Summons - Menekshe Law Firm, APC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Catherine Adams,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Catherine Adams,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Catherine Adams,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Menekshe Law Firm is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREEDMAN KENNETH A.