This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 15:07:23 (UTC).

Casey Alexander vs Cisco Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 Casey Alexander filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cisco Systems, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0541

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Casey Ford Alexander

Defendant

Cisco Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Raymond Matheny

Timothy Andrew Hall

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

6/27/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/23/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Minute Order

11/22/2022 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/17/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Notice: Association/Co-Counsel

10/17/2022 Notice: Association/Co-Counsel

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/28/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/28/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Conference: Further Case Management

6/27/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/23/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Minute Order

11/22/2022 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/17/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Notice: Association/Co-Counsel

10/17/2022 Notice: Association/Co-Counsel

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/28/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/28/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Conference: Further Case Management

6/27/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Notice: Association/Co-Counsel

10/17/2022 Notice: Association/Co-Counsel

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Casey Alexander,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Casey Alexander,; Comment: Case Management Statement (Statements)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Association/Co-Counsel; Filed By: Casey Alexander,; Comment: Association of Attorney/Counsel (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Casey Alexander,; Comment: Complaint (Case Initiation)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Casey Alexander,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Casey Alexander,; Comment: Summons (Summons)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less