This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/05/2023 at 01:03:00 (UTC).

Henry Nolasco vs DGDG 4, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 Henry Nolasco filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DGDG 4, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3166

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henry Nolasco

Defendants

DGDG 4, LLC

Great American Insurance Company

TD Bank, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Stanley Green

Kaden D Byron

Defendant Attorney

David Robert Sidran

 

Court Documents

Document: Other

3/20/2023 Document: Other

Statement of Damages

3/20/2023 Statement of Damages

Affidavit: Venue

3/20/2023 Affidavit: Venue

Summons: Issued/Filed

3/20/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/20/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/20/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Consent

4/25/2023 Consent

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/25/2023 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/25/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/25/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/25/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice: Settlement

6/9/2023 Notice: Settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

10/5/2023 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

10/5/2023 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

10/5/2023 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Request: Dismissal

7/20/2023 Request: Dismissal

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

7/26/2023 Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: Henry Nolasco,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service (Dismissals)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Henry Nolasco,; Comment: Entire Action with Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Henry Nolasco,; Comment: unconditional 6-8-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Henry Nolasco,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Henry Nolasco,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Henry Nolasco,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Consent; Filed By: DGDG 4, LLC, Great American Insurance Company,; Comment: Re: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: DGDG 4, LLC, Great American Insurance Company,; Comment: to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Henry Nolasco,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Document: Other; Filed By: Henry Nolasco,; Comment: Consent re Electronic Service Form and Notice of Electronic Service Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Henry Nolasco,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit: Venue; Filed By: Henry Nolasco,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Henry Nolasco,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement of Damages; Filed By: Henry Nolasco,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less