This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 10/11/2023 at 17:03:22 (UTC).

Robles, et al. v. Surefox North America, Inc., et al. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 Robles, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Surefox North America, Inc , Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2416

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Abelino Robles

Arturo Magdaleno

Defendants

SUREFOX NORTH AMERICA, INC.

SUREFOX CONSULTING, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arby Aiwazian

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Lawsuit Notice

9/13/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/13/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/13/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/15/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

 

Docket Entries

02/01/2024

HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Abelino Robles, Arturo Magdaleno,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Plaintiff's Complex Fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Abelino Robles, Arturo Magdaleno,; Comment: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Abelino Robles, Arturo Magdaleno,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice * 1st CMC set for 2/1/24 at 2:30pm in D19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less