This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/12/2023 at 01:02:45 (UTC).

Johnston v. G&P Enterprises, LLC dba Allied Trustee Services (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 04/11/2023 Johnston filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against G P Enterprises, LLC dba Allied Trustee Services Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3864

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Everet Johnston

Defendant

G&P Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Allied Trustee Services

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raeon Rodrigo Roulston

Matthew C Salmonsen

Fred W. Schwinn

Defendant Attorney

Natalie Perrin- Vance

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/11/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/11/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

4/12/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/21/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice: Appearance

5/16/2023 Notice: Appearance

Statement: Case Management Conference

8/2/2023 Statement: Case Management Conference

Notice: Remote Appearance

8/4/2023 Notice: Remote Appearance

Minute Order

8/11/2023 Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Remote Appearance; Filed By: G&P Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Allied Trustee Services,; Comment: Notice of Remote Appearance (throughout the case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Robert Johnston,; Comment: HRG 08-10-23 - Joint CMC Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appearance; Filed By: G&P Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Allied Trustee Services,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Robert Johnston,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Robert Johnston,; Comment: Class Action Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Robert Johnston,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Robert Johnston,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less