This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 06/13/2023 at 18:02:43 (UTC).

Denison v. Surgicare of Los Gatos, Inc., et al. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 04/14/2023 Denison filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Surgicare of Los Gatos, Inc , Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4112

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Denison

Defendants

Surgicare of Los Gatos, Inc.

Silicon Valley Surgery Center, L.P.

Surgicare of Silicon Valley, LLC

Los Gatos Surgical Center

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Rosenthal

William L. Marder

Kristen Michelle Agnew

Larry W Lee

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/14/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/14/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Lawsuit Notice

4/14/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

4/19/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

5/1/2023 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/15/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/15/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/15/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/15/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (Los Gatos Surgical Center)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (Silicon Valley Surgery Center, L.P.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (Surgicare of Los Gatos Inc.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (Surgicare of Silicon Valley, LLC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Comment: First Amended Class Action Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/TCZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Heather Denison,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Heather Denison,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice * 1st CMC set for 8/9/23 at 2:30pm in D19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Heather Denison,; Comment: Class Action Complaint * Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less