This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 06/13/2023 at 18:02:56 (UTC).

Martinez, et al. v. Copia Resources, Inc., et al. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 04/14/2023 Martinez, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Copia Resources, Inc , Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4279

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pedro Martinez

Juan Ibarra Montalvo

Jorge Guzman

Defendants

Copia Resources, Inc.

Samuel T Chung

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hector J Rodriguez

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Lawsuit Notice

4/14/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/14/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/14/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

4/20/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/TCZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Pedro Martinez, Juan Ibarra Montalvo, Jorge Guzman,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Pedro Martinez, Juan Ibarra Montalvo, Jorge Guzman,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Pedro Martinez, Juan Ibarra Montalvo, Jorge Guzman,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice * 1st CMC set for 8/9/23 at 2:30pm in D19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less